judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLAUDE ROBERT CROSBY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0153)
Case Number:S-10-0153Case Docketed On:07/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:CLAUDE ROBERT CROSBY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CLAUDE ROBERT CROSBY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantClaude Robert CrosbyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Crimes, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 44
Citation:247 P.3d 876 (Wyo. 2011).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/14/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/14/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11 and Stipulated Motion for Order Certifying Question to the Wyoming Supreme CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
07/27/2010Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefing, (additional portions of record submitted in a joint stipulated appendix or as attachments to briefs)OrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
08/02/2010Event - Other. Returned Check No. 7137 in the amount of $95.00, to the Attorney General's Office. Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 10.03, no docket fee is required for a certified question in a criminal matter.EventOtherFinal
08/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of "Designation of Record" filed in District Court and letter to Court Report requesting transcriptsNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/01/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Errata with attached stipulated Appendix 1EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/10/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified questions, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal