judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

R. SEAN HITE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0066)
Case Number:S-07-0066Case Docketed On:03/21/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:R. SEAN HITE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:R. SEAN HITE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantR. Sean HiteDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Timothy Justin Forwood

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 199
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/25/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/11/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
06/15/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/02/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/12/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/14/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/3/08 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal