judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHERMAN OATES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1168
Short Caption:SHERMAN OATES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 80-CF-0955 Consolidated:80-CF-1168, 83-CF-0030
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1217-79Filed Date:09/18/1980

Opening Event Date:09/18/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/1984
Argued/Submitted:03/27/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSherman Oates N
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Bertrand Shipley Thomas YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901OATES, SHERMAN UNITED STATES
09/18/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/11/1981FiledRecord Completed
01/20/1984FiledBriefing Completed
03/27/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/25/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition