judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPENCER VS. CITY OF FALLON

Case Information: 36477
Short Caption:SPENCER VS. CITY OF FALLONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24288Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/31/2000 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael E. Langton--check no. 1885.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12834
07/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Docket Entries. Due Date: 10 days
07/31/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-16790
09/22/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-16791
10/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-18171
10/13/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.