judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDON DEAN BLAKEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0152)
Case Number:S-10-0152Case Docketed On:07/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:BRANDON DEAN BLAKEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRANDON DEAN BLAKEMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandon Dean Blakeman Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/26/2010Brief - Appellant. No service made on Attorney General, copy sent todayBriefAppellantFinal
07/30/2010Motion - Other - for Reversal/review/vacate on appeal by reason of factual i-nasence (sic) pursuant Rule 1.04 WRAP appx. No service made on AG, copy sent via interofficeMotionOtherFinal
08/05/2010Motion - Accept misc. documentsMotionAccept misc. documentsFinal
08/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Permission to Attach AppendicesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/11/2010Record - Received unfiled records from Attorney General's OfficeRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Other Letter requesting voluntary dismissal of appeal and amendment of sex offender registration status. Not served on Attorney General, copy sent (Treated as motion).Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/24/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for AG, will not respond to most recent motion.EventPhone CallFinal
08/24/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Various pleadings received in mail, case dismissed, returned unfiled.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/30/2010Brief - Other - Received 3 pages of brief of appellant that appellant had mistakenly left off the brief when filed.BriefOtherFinal
08/31/2010Event - Rejected Filing - received "motion for discovery" - returned with letter.EventRejected FilingFinal
09/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal