judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0510
Short Caption:EDWARD L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7449-03Filed Date:04/21/2011

Opening Event Date:04/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/04/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward L. Williams Y
Donna L. BidermanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Leslie Ann Gerardo NN
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/22/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Donna Biderman, Esquire
05/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no new transcript is needed for this appeal, and it further appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Donna Biderman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to April 22, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/24/2011RECORD INDEX
05/24/2011RECORD COPIES
05/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/15/2011FiledOrder directing brief and limited appendix of appellant.
08/10/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until Sept. 27, 2011(Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until September 27, 2011
10/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until October 31, 2010 (Appellant)Granted
11/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix to the extent that the brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order.
11/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until January 30, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
12/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 30, 2012
02/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an exrtensoin of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before March 30, 21012
04/19/2012FiledOrdered that appellant counsel shall within 15 days from the date of this order file the brief and limited appendix accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time
04/27/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/21/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited apepndix on or before May 29, 2012, or counsel shall show cause why she should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order
05/29/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/29/2012FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
06/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
06/28/2012FiledBriefing Completed
07/13/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/17/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/20/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/29/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
11/29/2012FiledMemorandum letting court know that Nicholas Coleman will argue the case (Appellee)
11/29/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/04/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Glickman,Blackburne-Rigsby,Farrell, Donna L. Biderman Esq.,for appellant, Nicholas Coleman Esq.,for appellee.
12/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
01/03/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
01/09/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 2/18/13.
02/19/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/02/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
05/10/2013FiledMandate
08/05/2013LodgedReceived - copy of motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed in Supreme Court. (Appellant)
08/08/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/09/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)