judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEHNER (HAROLD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36476
Short Caption:DEHNER (HAROLD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C165392Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12832
08/02/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/15/00; 6/7/00; 6/28/00. Court Reporter: Robert H. Mintun. 00-13358
09/08/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15906
09/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. On September 8, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on September 22, 2000. 00-17118
09/27/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-16818
09/27/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-16819
10/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18433
10/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward, within 20 days of the date of this order, a certified copy of the presentence report, in a sealed envelope, for filing and consideratin with the appendix. 00-18811
11/02/2000Other Other. Filed Presentence Report (SEALED). 00-19268
11/02/2000Other Other. Received documents submitted at Sentencing (Defendant's Sentencing Memorandum and Submission of Documents). 00-19330
11/27/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand to the district court with instructions to vacate appellant's sentence and hold a new sentencing hearing before a different district court judge . . . we further order the Clark County District Attorney to specifically perform the plea bargain agreement." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20623
12/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20785
12/27/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2000. 00-20785