judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY L. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0509
Short Caption:ANTHONY L. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL5923-93Filed Date:04/21/2011

Opening Event Date:04/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony L. Coleman YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
L. Jackson Thomas, IINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 21, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/17/2011RECORD INDEX
05/17/2011RECORD COPIES
05/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/12/2011FiledAppendix attached to Brief (Appellant)
08/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/31/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
09/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until October 18, 2011 (Appellee)
09/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until October 18, 2011
10/17/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
10/18/2011LodgedReceived - Amended certificate of service to the motion for summary affirmance (Appellee)
10/20/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition to Appellee's Brief /(MESAF), for 21 days. Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
11/09/2011FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and OPPOSITION SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 28, 2011.
12/20/2011FiledGranted, sua sponte to file lodged late opposition and granted motion for summary affirmance. (THOBNK)
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
12/20/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance. (Appellant)
01/11/2012FiledMandate