judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FIRST STATE BANK OF ABILENE AND H. C. LOGAN, TRUSTEES OF THE SWENSON TRUST, STEPHENS COUNTY MUSEUM, INC., STEPHENS COUNTY MUSEUM, INC., ET AL. v. CLARA J. SWENSON AND ALMA B. SWENSON

Case: B-4305
B-4305
11/15/1973
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST STATE BANK OF ABILENE AND H. C. LOGAN, TRUSTEES OF THE SWENSON TRUST, STEPHENS COUNTY MUSEUM, INC., STEPHENS COUNTY MUSEUM, INC., ET AL.
CLARA J. SWENSON AND ALMA B. SWENSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/30/1974Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/19/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/18/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/18/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/03/1974Response to Brief filedPetitioner
08/30/1974Post submission brief filedRespondent
11/26/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
11/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/30/1975Letter Filed
12/30/1974Supplemental Brief filed
12/23/1974Response to Motion filed
12/19/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/18/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/18/1974Miscellaneous Motion
12/18/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/04/1974Opinion issued
10/03/1974Response to Brief filed
08/30/1974Post submission brief filed
06/25/1974Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksDenied
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1974Document received (See Remarks)
11/26/1973Response to Petition
11/20/1973Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
11/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/15/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stephens County Museum, Inc.Petitioner
Clara J. Swenson and Alma B. SwensonRespondent
Stephens County Museum, Inc., et al.Petitioner
First State Bank of Abilene and H. C. Logan, Trustees of the Swenson TrustPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information