Case Information: 33626 | |||
Short Caption: | LAMBERT (CHARLES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140239 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/19/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/19/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00341 | |
03/02/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. Nos. 33574, 33575, 33626, 33631, 33677, 33687, 33697, 33700. | 99-01412 | |
06/17/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 99-05247 | |
06/17/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/31/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper peron documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-19170 | |
11/28/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-19427 | |
11/28/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/11/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. | 00-19427 |