judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JADA L. SORENSEN v. JEREMIAH FOWLER

Case Heading (S-10-0143)
Case Number:S-10-0143Case Docketed On:06/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JADA L. SORENSEN v. JEREMIAH FOWLER
Full Title:JADA L. SORENSEN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. JEREMIAH FOWLER Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJada L. SorensenMary T. Parsons
AppelleeJeremiah FowlerCatherine M. Fox

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received from counsel. Copies requested from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
06/29/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
07/06/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
07/08/2010Motion - Dismiss partyMotionDismiss partyFinal
07/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Honorable Roberta A. Coates' motion to be dismissedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/13/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntary and Dismissing Hon. Roberta A. Coates from case (Caption Amended)OrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/29/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal