judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WAGENVOORD VS. ALVERSON

Case Information: 33625
Short Caption:WAGENVOORD VS. ALVERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A376252Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/28/1999 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/19/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
01/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00342
01/19/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
01/28/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement due: 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-01576
03/24/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-02130
03/24/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-02131
03/24/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-02132
03/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court. We defer ruling on the stipulation to dismiss this appeal pending the submission of the filng fee. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 99-02349
04/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Patrick C. Clary Chartered--check no. 9448.
06/07/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). The order entered March 5, 1999, directing appellants to file the docketing statement is vacated. SNP/CLK 99-04699
06/07/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.