judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HOWARD ULYSSES FREEMAN v. BILL W. CARROLL

Case: B-4309
B-4309
11/19/1973
Application for Writ of Error
HOWARD ULYSSES FREEMAN
BILL W. CARROLL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/20/1974Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/06/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/18/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/05/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
11/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/20/1974Brief in Support of Petition
02/12/1974Response to Motion filed
02/06/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/18/1973Reply to Response
12/05/1973Response to Petition
11/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/19/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bill W. CarrollRespondent
Howard Ulysses FreemanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information