Case Information: 17-CF-0314 | |||
Short Caption: | BERNARD TENSLEY V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF3-4988-16 | Filed Date: | 03/27/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/27/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 09/11/2017 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/26/2018 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/18/2018 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/31/2018 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Bernard Tensley | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
03/27/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
04/04/2017 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
04/04/2017 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Charles B. Wayne, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
04/20/2017 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
06/12/2017 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
06/12/2017 | Filed | Record Index | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #1 (71 pages/Hall) 10/18/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (6 pages/Hall) 10/18/16 proceeding **SEALED** | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (72-175 pages/Hall) 10/19/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (176-239 pages/Hall) 10/20/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (90 pages/Hunt) 10/25/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (91-289 pages/Hunt) 10/26/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #7 (290-413 pages/Hunt) 10/27/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #8 (414-598 pages/Hunt) 10/31/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #9 (599-818 pages/Hunt) 11/1/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #10 (819-1009 pages/Hunt) 11/2/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #11 (1010-1215 pages/Hunt) 11/3/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #12 (160 pages/Maren) 11/7/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #13 (161-366 pages/tape) 11/8/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #14 (310-314 pages/Maren) 11/9/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #15 (315-366 pages/Maren) 11/10/16 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #16 (7 pages/tape) 1/18/17 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #17 (27 pages/tape) 3/1/17 proceeding | ||
09/11/2017 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
09/13/2017 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
10/11/2017 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
10/12/2017 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 11/22/17 | ||
11/22/2017 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
11/22/2017 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
12/22/2017 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
01/04/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 1/26/18 | ||
01/26/2018 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
01/26/2018 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/09/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | ||
02/13/2018 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | ||
02/16/2018 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
07/31/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
09/14/2018 | Filed | Letter Received regarding Attorney Willis arguing in place of Attorney Robertson (Appellee) | ||
09/14/2018 | Filed | Rule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee) | ||
09/18/2018 | Filed | Argued Before Chief Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge Glickman, and Senior Judge Washington. (Brian J. Young Esq.,for the appellant) (Jillian Willis Esq.,for the appellee). | ||
10/09/2018 | Filed | Affirmed by MOJ | ||
10/31/2018 | Filed | Mandate |