judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAYS (ROBERT) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 33617
Short Caption:HAYS (ROBERT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33616
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI98207Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00285
01/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Judgment: "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. Nos. 33616, 33617. 99-01052
03/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01876
03/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 1999. 99-01876