judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIERRA PACIFIC VS. BRADY POWER PARTNERS

Case Information: 36480
Short Caption:SIERRA PACIFIC VS. BRADY POWER PARTNERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24846Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/09/2000 / Jenkins, NathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
07/25/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woodburn & Wedge--check no. 57522.
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12838
07/31/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Second copy of notice of appeal filed on 7/19/00; this packet includes documents omitted from first notice of appeal.) 00-14237
08/18/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Patrick O. King.
10/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins.
02/21/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. 01-03225
02/26/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-03548
03/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 01-04355
03/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.