Case Information: 18-CV-0629 | |||
Short Caption: | CHRISTABELLE MUSHALA V. DANCING STRAWBERRY, LLC | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LTB6979-18 | Filed Date: | 06/05/2018 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/05/2018 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/14/2018 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Christabelle Mushala | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Dancing Strawberry, LLC | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/05/2018 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
06/29/2018 | Filed | Ordered that appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order file the required mediation screening statement. It is Further Ordered that counsel for both parties shall sign up for the Court's mandatory e-filing pursuant to Administrative Order 1-18 forthwith. | ||
07/10/2018 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant) | Granted | |
07/17/2018 | Filed | Record Index | ||
07/23/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant) | ||
07/23/2018 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
08/14/2018 | Filed | Mandate |