judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON v. LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY

Case Heading (S-10-0119)
Case Number:S-10-0119Case Docketed On:05/28/2010
Linked To: S-10-0054 , S-10-0055
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON v. LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY
Full Title:THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas L. WilsonFrank J. Jones
AppellantHelen L. WilsonFrank J. Jones
AppelleeLucerne Canal and Power CompanyHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Easements, Water Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 7
Citation:246 P.3d 265

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/28/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/28/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/11/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellants, believes that this appeal is taken from case where clients were Plaintiffs below. Caption changed.EventPhone CallFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Other - Letter with amended captionNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
06/15/2010Brief - Appellant and Statement of CostsBriefAppellantFinal
06/16/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
06/16/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant, proposed Order included with hard copiesEventPhone CallFinal
06/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to consolidateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Lucerne Canal and Power Company's response to motion to consolidate casesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2010Order - Granting, in part, motion to consolidate cases and order granting motion for separate argument (all three cases consolidated for decision, oral argument in cases S-10-0055 and S-10-0119 will be held separately from S-10-0054)OrderGrantFinal
07/07/2010Event - Phone Call - Spoke with Bonnie Petsch, Clerk of District Court, regarding the record requests in two of these cases. She is going to send the record in case S-10-0054 as it is completed. She will then send the record in both S-10-0055 & S-10-0119 once we request the record in S-10-0119 as briefing hasn't been completed yet and they both involve the same record.EventPhone CallFinal
08/02/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Lucerne Canal and Power Company's response brief related to District Court's "Order approving Lucerne Canal and Power Company's certificate of costs".EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/09/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Lucerne Canal and Power Company's Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Oral Argument; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/27/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, six volumes, (Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volumes III & IV, Transcripts; Volume V & VI, Exhibits)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Harriet Hageman for appellee Lucerne Canal & Power Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to vacate and reset; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2010Order - Oral argument - amending schedule - order vacating and rescheduling argument. (From 10/19/10 to 10/21/10).OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
09/27/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Jones for Thomas and Helen Wilson.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frank J. Jones for appellants; Harriet M. Hageman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal