judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SONNY HWANG v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-10-0120)
Case Number:S-10-0120Case Docketed On:06/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:SONNY HWANG v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:SONNY HWANG, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSonny HwangR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
John Sanford Shumway

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2011 WY 20
Citation:247 P.3d 861

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2010Fees - Docket Fee ReceivedFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/15/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant. Received hard copies in mail. Brief not electronically filed yet--in "Draft" statusEventPhone CallFinal
07/15/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Sonny Hwang (Reminded counsel to correct certificate of service)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/21/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/28/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/03/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
02/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/25/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/25/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/28/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal