judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRICE (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33607
Short Caption:TRICE (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982017Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00244
01/13/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/20/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: sentencing--12/11/98. Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. 99-00400
02/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (mailed on: 01/29/99). 99-00665
02/01/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (mailed on: 01/29/99). 99-00666
02/11/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00957
03/25/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 The Honorable Robert Rose, Chief Justice, participated in the decision of this case in the place of the Honorable Debora A. Agosti, Justice, who voluntarily disqualified herself. SNP99A-RR/WM/NB 99-02153
04/20/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03064
04/20/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/27/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 1999. 99-03064