judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SALLAHADIN M. BIRHAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0479
Short Caption:SALLAHADIN M. BIRHAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-4110-07Filed Date:04/18/2011

Opening Event Date:04/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSallahadin M. Birhan Y
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Laura G. Coates YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
08/16/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/16/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
09/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (20 pgs/Coney) 4/1/08 proc
09/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify #2 (283 pgs/Gilliam) 4/2-3/08 proc. w/cd
10/03/2011FiledRecord Copies
10/03/2011FiledRecord Index
10/13/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (8 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 4/7/08 proc. w/cd
10/14/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)
10/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/14/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/26/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to supplement the record
11/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (Appdx 1-2-3)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Farrell
05/03/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Assoicate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge)
05/25/2012FiledMandate
08/06/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/04/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)