judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF A PETITION FOR A PRIVATE ROAD: MARK AND LAURA VOSS v. PETER AND KIM STEVENS, and BEVERLY GOODMAN, and THE HEIRS, ASSIGNS, and SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF RICHARD GOODMAN,

Case Heading (S-10-0115)
Case Number:S-10-0115Case Docketed On:05/19/2010
Linked To: S-10-0058
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF A PETITION FOR A PRIVATE ROAD: MARK AND LAURA VOSS v. PETER AND KIM STEVENS, and BEVERLY GOODMAN, and THE HEIRS, ASSIGNS, and SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST OF RICHARD GOODMAN,
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF A PETITION FOR A PRIVATE ROAD: MARK AND LAURA VOSS, Appellants (Petitioners), v. PETER AND KIM STEVENS, and BEVERLY GOODMAN, and the heirs, assigns, and successors in interest of RICHARD GOODMAN, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark Towne Voss Pro Se
AppellantLaura M. Voss Pro Se
AppelleePeter StevensDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeKim StevensDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeBeverly B. GoodmanGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
AppelleeRichard GoodmanGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2011 WY 33
Citation:248 P.3d 1120

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/19/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/19/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/19/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
05/24/2010Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/08/2010Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
07/12/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Time for Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/19/2010Response/Objection - ExtensionResponse/ObjectionExtensionFinal
07/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - response to motion for extension to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2010Order - Granting in part and denying in part Appellants' Motion for Extension of TimeOrderGrantFinal
08/26/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs (binder with attachments discarded when mandate issued)BriefAppellantFinal
08/30/2010Motion - Correct a DocumentMotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
08/31/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to file corrected brief; received proposed order and proposed exhibits.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2010Order - Deny - Order denying motion to file corrected brief.OrderDenyFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
10/08/2010Brief - Appellees (Goodman)BriefAppelleeFinal
10/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Beverly GoodmanEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellees Goodman)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/11/2010Brief - Appellees (Stevens)BriefAppelleeFinal
10/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Peter and Kim StevensEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/25/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record Appellants Additional DesignationNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-VI, Agency Records & Transcripts; Volume VII, Cassette Tapes & Transcripts; Volume VIII, Transcripts; Volume IX, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2010Order - Assignment of judge David B. Park to act in this matter and recusing Chief Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gay Woodhouse and Deborah Roden for Beverly Goodman.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark T. Voss, pro se.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2010Order - Assignment of judge - Order rescinding assignment of Judge David B. Park and Order assigning Judge John R. Perry to act in this matter and recusing Chief Justice Kite.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
12/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Daniel B. Frank for appellees Stevens.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke, and Perry, DJ (Gay V. Woodhouse for appellants Goodman; Mark T. Voss and Laura M. Voss, argument by Mr. Voss for appellees Voss; and Daniel B. Frank for appellees Stevens in Case No. S-10-0115) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Voigt writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/15/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/15/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/05/2011Service - Other - Receipt of RecordServiceOtherFinal