judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRANK E. KLINE, JR. v. OPPORTUNITY UNLIMITED OF HOUSTON, INC.

Case: B-4328
B-4328
12/04/1973
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK E. KLINE, JR.
OPPORTUNITY UNLIMITED OF HOUSTON, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/19/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
12/17/1973Errata FiledPetitioner
12/04/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/17/1974Supplement or amendment to application.
12/19/1973Response to Petition
12/17/1973Errata Filed
12/12/1973Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
12/04/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/04/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Opportunity Unlimited of Houston, Inc.Respondent
Frank E. Kline, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information