judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SARACINA (DWIGHT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33606
Short Caption:SARACINA (DWIGHT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P1139Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00243
01/22/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 11/25/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Erin T. Luschar. 99-00459
02/05/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00832
02/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-00833
02/25/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01293
04/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals (Nos. 29888, 33606) for disposition. fn3[Docket No. 33606 is subject to NRAP 3C--the fast track rules. We deny appellant's request for full briefing]. Judgment: "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML Nos. 29888, 33606. 99-03322
05/25/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04308
05/25/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/02/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 28, 1999. 99-04308