judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLYNN P. NEAL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0478
Short Caption:GLYNN P. NEAL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-11712-10Filed Date:04/14/2011

Opening Event Date:04/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/22/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/29/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlynn P. Neal Y
James W. KleinNY
Stefanie SchneiderYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Harry B. Roback YN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (17 pgs/Hawkins) 7/2/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (72 pgs/Gilliam) 1/10/11 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (242 pgs/McCarn) 1/11/11 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (447 pgs/Gilliam) 1/12-13/11 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (187 pgs/Davis) 1/18-19/11 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 914 pgs/Hunt) 3/31/11 proc. w/cd
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX
07/07/2011RECORD COPIES
07/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief 90 Days (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 11/21/11.
11/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/20/12.
02/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 5/21/12
05/21/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
05/21/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/21/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/30/2012FiledOrder Granting motion to supplement the record
06/11/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (photo copy of facebook page of complaining witness)
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
06/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 7/22/12
07/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/24/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/22/12
08/22/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/22/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/15/2012FiledLetter From appellant addressed to his counsel (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/02/2013FiledMotion to file corrected appendix. (Appellant)Granted
01/11/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file corrected appendix.
01/11/2013FiledAppendix (corrected) (Appellant)
01/15/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/29/2013FiledArgued Before Fisher,Thompson,Blackburne-Rigsby, Stefanie Schneider Esq.,for appellant, Harry B. Roback Esq.,for appellee.
01/30/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
01/30/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/27/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Thompson, Associate Judges.)
03/22/2013FiledMandate
03/22/2013FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)