judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY KENT OPITZ v. SHELIE KAY OPITZ

Case Heading (S-07-0015)
Case Number:S-07-0015Case Docketed On:01/18/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:GARY KENT OPITZ v. SHELIE KAY OPITZ
Full Title:GARY KENT OPITZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. SHELIE KAY OPITZ, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Kent OpitzGibson Sean Benham
AppelleeShelie Kay OpitzKeith Robert Nachbar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 207
Citation:173 P.3d 405

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/18/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/18/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/07/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/26/2007Correspondence - Incoming - Copy of letter from Judge Park regarding transcript. No action.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/17/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Other received court reporter's certificate of completionNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended index, no action necessaryNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/13/2007Brief - Appellee Shelie Kay Opitz; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/30/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/31/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/01/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from clerk of district court indicating that counsel for appellant has not filed designation of record. Will send letter.EventPhone CallFinal
08/02/2007Notice-Incoming - No designation of record - received letter from clerk of district court indicating that counsel for appellant did not file a designation of record.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
08/02/2007Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
08/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/13/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
12/28/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/17/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/16/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal