judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WASHINGTON, JOSEPH A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1159
Short Caption:WASHINGTON, JOSEPH A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4132-79Filed Date:09/30/1980

Opening Event Date:09/30/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/22/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:03/03/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WASHINGTON, JOSEPH A. UNITED STATES
09/30/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/22/1981FiledRecord Completed
11/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
03/03/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition