judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COMPANHIA BRASILEIRA CARBURETO DE CALICIO, ET AL V. APPLIED INDUSTRIAL MATERIALS CORPORATION, ET AL

Case Information: 11-SP-0500
Short Caption:COMPANHIA BRASILEIRA CARBURETO DE CALICIO, ET AL V. APPLIED INDUSTRIAL MATERIALS CORPORATION, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Certified Question Of Law
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:10-7051Filed Date:04/22/2011

Opening Event Date:04/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCompanhia Brasileria Carbureto De CalicioN
Michael Robert Lazerwitz NN
Steven J. GreenfogelNN
AppellantCompanhia Ferroligas Minas Gerais-MinasligasN
Michael Robert Lazerwitz NN
Steven J. GreenfogelNN
AppellantCia. De De Ferroligas Da Bahia-Ferbasa N
Michael Robert Lazerwitz NN
Daniel B. Allanoff NN
Steven J. GreenfogelNN
AppelleeApplied Industrial Materials CorporationN
Charles R. Claxton NN
AppelleeElkem Metals Company Inc.N
Edward J. Longosz, IINY
AppelleeElkem A/s N
Edward J. Longosz, IINY
Dale Hershey YN
Michael R. Borasky NN
AppelleeCc Metals & Alloys Inc.N
James Harold HulmeYN
AppelleeEvonik Degussa N
Marianne R. Casserly NN
Alan KanzerYN
Amber WesselsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/22/2011CERTIFICATION OF QUESTION OF LAW received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Court, order and opinion dated April 15, 2011 - includes dockets from the U.S. Court of Appeals D.C.Circuit and the U.S. District Court
04/22/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief (3 cys) and Appendix Vols 1 & 2 and a Supplemental)
04/22/2011RECEIVED - Joint Brief of Appellees (3 cys)
04/22/2011RECEIVED - Appellants' Reply Brief (3 cys)
04/22/2011RECEIVED Appendix Volumes 1 & 2
04/22/2011RECEIVED Supplemental appendix
04/27/2011ORDER On consideration of the order, dated Arpil 15, 2011, of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, received in this Court on April 22, 2011, certifying a question of law pursuant to D.C. Code Sec 11-723, it is ORDERED that all parties shall file a statement pursuant to Rule 22 (a)(2) on or before May 16, 2011. (ETW)
04/27/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - for Daniel B. Allanoff
04/27/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - for Bruce K. Cohen
04/29/2011ORDER On consideration of the motion of Michael R. Lazerwith, Esquire, requesting that the appearance of Daniel Allanoff, Esquire, be entered pro hac vice on behalf of Companhia Brasilerira Carbureto De Calicio, et al., it is ORDERED that the motion of Michael R. Lazerwitz, Esquire is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Daniel Allanoff, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of Companhia Brasilerira Carbureto De Calicio, et al. (ETW)
05/06/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Dale Hershey w/receipt attached
05/06/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (Michael Borasky) w/ receipt
05/09/2011ORDER On consideration of the motion of Edward J. Longosz, II, Esquire, requesting that the appearances of Dale Hershey, Esquire, and Michael R. Borasky, Esquire, be entered pro hac vice on behalf of Applied Industrial Materials Corporation, et al., it is ORDERED that the motion of Edward J. Longosz,II, Esquire, is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearances of Dale Hershey, Esquire, and Michael R. Borasky, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of Applied Industrial Materials Corporation, et al. (ETW)
05/09/2011ORDER On consideration of the motion of Edward J. Longosz, II, Esquire, requesting that the appearances of Dale Hershey, Esquire, and Michael R. Borasky, Esquire, be entered pro hac vice on behalf of Applied Industrial Materials Corporation, et al, it is ORDERED that the motion of Edward J. Longosz,II, Esquire, is granted and the Clerk shall enter the apperances of Dale Hershey, Esqire and Michael R. Borasky, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of Applied Industiral Materials Corporation, et al. (ETW)
05/09/2011ORDER On consideration of the motion of Michael R. Lazerwitz, Esquire, requesting that the appearance of Bruce K. Cohen, Esqure, be entered pro hac vice on behalf of Companhia Brasilerira Carbureto De Calicio, et al., it is ORDERED that the motion of Michael R. Lazerwirz, Esquire is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Bruce K. Cohen, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of Companhia Brasilerira Carbureto De Calicio, et al. (ETW)
05/12/2011STATEMENT from appellants pursuant to Rule 22 (a)(2) that the record supplied by the United States Court of Appeals for the DC Circuit is adequate to decide the issue presented herein.
05/13/2011STATEMENT of appellees pursuant to Rule 22 (a)(2) that the certification and accompanying papers are adequate to enable this court to decide the certified question posed by the US Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit.
07/11/2011FiledOrder on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider this matter that the Clerk is directed to schedule this matter for argument on the regular calendar of October, 2011. (JAC)
07/11/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
07/11/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/02/2011FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appellee Degussa)
09/14/2011FiledOrder Granting Alan Kanzer to appear pro hac vice.
09/20/2011FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appellee Degussa)
09/22/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt Amber Wessells motion to appear pro hac vice.
10/27/2011FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher, Oberly
01/09/2012FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appellant Companhia Brasileria Carbureto De Calicio, Appellant Companhia Ferroligas Minas Gerais-Minasligas, Appellant De Ferroligas Da Bahia-Ferbasa) w/ receipt attached
01/25/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for special admission of Steven J. Greenfogel.
01/26/2012FiledAnswer To Certified Question Of Law (Washington, Chief Judge, and Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges.)
01/26/2012FiledLETTER to Mark J. Langer, Clerk, United States Court of Appeals transmitting a certified copy of the opinion filed on January 26, 2012, pursuant to Rule 54(c) of the General Rules of this court.
01/31/2012FiledNotice of withdrawal from Meredith Cohen Greenfogel & Skirnick, P.C. on behalf of the appellants (Appellant Companhia Brasileria Carbureto De Calicio, Appellant Companhia Ferroligas Minas Gerais-Minasligas, Appellant De Ferroligas Da Bahia-Ferbasa, Appellee A/s)
02/01/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Charles R. Claxton