judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUFFNER VS. SIIS

Case Information: 33619
Short Caption:RUFFNER VS. SIISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9801369A
Carson City - First Judicial District - 9300386
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/11/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Donald L. Ruffner, Sr.--cash
01/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00293
02/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00967
03/11/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 8. Mailed on: hand delivered 3/11/99. 99-01766
03/11/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/15/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 9. Mailed on: hand delivered 3/15/99. 99-01865
04/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from him. We deny all unresolved motions as moot.] -SNP99B-WM/MS/NB (nos. 33619/34487). 00-06807
05/23/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-08595
05/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2000. 00-08595