judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM PITTARD V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 11-AA-0499
Short Caption:WILLIAM PITTARD V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPWK400874-10Filed Date:04/22/2011

Opening Event Date:04/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/12/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerWilliam PittardNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Richard S. LoveNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/22/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY).
04/22/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
05/27/2011 ORDERED that the request to waive the $100 filing fee is denied. It is F/O that petitioner is hereby directed within 15 days from the date of this order to tender the $100 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
06/01/2011FILING FEE
06/01/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
06/06/2011TMC - motion to stay - oppo
06/13/2011RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION - to petitioner's motion to stay
06/15/2011 ORDERED that PETITONER'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED... It is ****MORE****
06/15/2011 F/ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (GLRDTE)
01/12/2012FiledRecord On Appeal W/ 3/15/10 HEARING
01/12/2012FiledRecord Completed
01/27/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
03/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 5/7/12
05/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until June 6, 2012 (Petitioner)Granted
05/14/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until June 6, 2012 (Petitioner)
06/06/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
06/06/2012FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Petitioner)
06/22/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Granted
07/02/2012FiledOpposition to respondent's motion for summary affirmance (Petitioner)
07/09/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO
10/31/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
10/31/2012FiledAffirmed
12/04/2012FiledMandate