judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD RAY DAVES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0135)
Case Number:S-10-0135Case Docketed On:06/17/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DONALD RAY DAVES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD RAY DAVES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald Ray DavesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin Ashkhan Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 47
Citation:249 P.3d 250 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/17/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/22/2010Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion and copies of Motion for Extension of Time and Certificate of CompletionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
08/04/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
09/21/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and approval for Justin Daraie, Student Intern to appear on behalf of the Appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder, Exhibits and Transcripts; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Dariae for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/14/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/30/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/30/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/01/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/31/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal