judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

E. D. RICHARDSON v. CITY OF PASADENA, ET AL.

Case: B-4312
B-4312
11/20/1973
Application for Writ of Error
E. D. RICHARDSON
CITY OF PASADENA, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/08/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/21/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/07/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
11/20/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/16/1974Response to Motion filed
08/08/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/24/1974Opinion issued
05/01/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/21/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/07/1973Response to Petition
11/20/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/20/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. D. RichardsonPetitioner
Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
City of Pasadena, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information