judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IVY VS. IVY

Case Information: 33614
Short Caption:IVY VS. IVYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D090863Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Jimmerson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Frances-Ann Fine--check no. 1002.
01/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00279
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for appellant by attorney Frances-Ann Fine. 99-00870
02/11/1999Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. Mailed on: 2/9/99. 99-00974
02/16/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-01043
02/18/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: docketing statement. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on February 11, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-01110
02/18/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00974
02/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Mailed on: 2/24/99. 99-01395
02/26/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Mailed on 2/24/99. 99-01396
02/26/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. Mailed on: 2/24/99. 99-01397
03/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42 (b). The pending motion to withdraw as appellant's counsel is moot. NNP/CLK. 99-01710
03/11/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.