judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GUILLERMO EDUARDO GOMEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0131)
Case Number:S-10-0131Case Docketed On:06/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:GUILLERMO EDUARDO GOMEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GUILLERMO EDUARDO GOMEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGuillermo Eduardo Gomez Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2010 WY 140
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received. Pro se notice of appeal filedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
06/15/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/02/2010Brief - Anders (No Response Time)BriefAndersFinal
08/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/02/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Eric AldenMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received -Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2010Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
10/12/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
10/27/2010Opinion - Published order Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2010Record - Returned unfiled record to district court clerkRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Unfiled record signed for 11/18/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal