judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAMAR WENDELL THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0495
Short Caption:LAMAR WENDELL THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD18773-10Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/29/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/05/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/13/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLamar Wendell Thompson Y
Moses CookYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Harry B. Roback YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Moses Cook, Esquire, is hereby assigned to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6pgs/Tape) 10/7/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5pgs/Tape) 11/2/10 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 1/19/11 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (106pgs/Tape) 3/18/11 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (80pgs/Tape) 3/21/11 proc. w/CD
06/16/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/21/2011RECORD INDEX
06/21/2011RECORD COPIES
06/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - for 180 days Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 30, 2012
01/30/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before February 29, 2012
02/29/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/29/2012FiledAppendix (Attched to Brief) (Appellant)
03/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File until April 30, 2012 Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before April 30, 2012
04/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until May 30, 2012 (Appellee)Granted
05/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before May 30, 2012
05/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/30/2012FiledNotice Received that appellant consents to appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee)
06/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or beofre June 29, 2012
06/29/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
06/29/2012FiledBriefing Completed
07/13/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/17/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/07/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/08/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
11/08/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/13/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)Granted
12/04/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to continue argument.
12/05/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Beckwith, Belson Meredith Dempsey, Esq. for appellant Harry B. Roback, Esq. for appellee
01/17/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
02/13/2013FiledMandate