judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTONE-MAN VS. MAN

Case Information: 33613
Short Caption:ANTONE-MAN VS. MANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9602223Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Richard W. Young-check no. 3797.
01/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00275
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00636
02/09/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Clarkson Law Office, Ltd.--check no. 1740.
02/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 99-00893
02/12/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter. Munnell. (Notice of Cross-Appeal.)
02/24/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. for Respondent/Cross-Appellant. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr 2/24/99). 99-01264
03/08/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-01618
03/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference and the agreement of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-01885
03/16/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.