Case: PD-0060-90
PD-0060-90
01/15/1990
PDR Case Type
VESCHI, KEVIN AKA VESCHI, KEVIN JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/13/1990 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
03/28/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
02/15/1990 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
01/15/1990 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/23/1990 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Steven C Hilbig |
VESCHI, KEVIN AKA VESCHIKEVI | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Mark Stevens |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00075-CR
Aff 11-30-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
290th District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann, Jr
87-CR-4730-B