judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WMC MORTGAGE VS. F.T. MORTGAGE

Case Information: 33611
Short Caption:WMC MORTGAGE VS. F.T. MORTGAGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9802651Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Schreck Morris--check no. 33611
01/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00268
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/12/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal without Prejudice. 99-01003
02/24/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Without prejudice and without costs. Mailed on: no date on postmark. 99-01263
02/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a stipulation for dismissal of this appeal, with prejudice, or file the docketing statement and otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-01333
03/12/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-01807
03/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-01989
03/19/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.