judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL DARREN DOWNING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0128)
Case Number:S-10-0128Case Docketed On:06/07/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MICHAEL DARREN DOWNING v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL DARREN DOWNING, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Darren DowningDonald L. Fuller
Ian Keith Sandefer
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 113
Citation:259 P.3d 365

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/07/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court 03/23/2010. Docketing delayed until resolution of IFP status.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/16/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/19/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/06/2010Motion - Remand to district court and for stay of briefing scheduleMotionRemand to district courtFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Remand for Evidentiary Hearing on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel and for Stay of Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Order - Denying Motion for Partial RemandOrderDenyFinal
09/30/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Michael Darren DowningEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/07/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ian K. Sandefer for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/13/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ian Keith Sandefer for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/23/2011Order - Remand - CaleneOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
06/01/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk re status of remand, setting scheduled for 06/07/2011. Hearing on State's "Motion for Clarification" set for 06/07/2011. Does not appear hearing on remand has been held yet.EventPhone CallFinal
06/03/2011Record - Record returned to district court judge for remand hearingRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/24/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law on the Claim of Ineffective Assistance of CounselRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
06/27/2011Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court clerk, three additional volumes. Volume VI, Original Papers; Volume VII, Transcript; Volume VIII, Exhibits.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
06/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
06/28/2011Order - Other - Following RemandOrderOtherFinal
07/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/27/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Warden Murphy received opinion.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/10/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/10/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 8/12/2011 by agent for Warden at WMCI.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal