judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

B. A. MOBLEY, ET AL. v. JOHN T. STEWART, III, ET AL.

Case: B-4316
B-4316
11/26/1973
Application for Writ of Error
B. A. MOBLEY, ET AL.
JOHN T. STEWART, III, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/06/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/06/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
11/26/1973Appendix FiledPetitioner
11/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/14/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/07/1974Response to Motion filed
02/06/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1973Response to Petition
11/26/1973Appendix Filed
11/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/26/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B. A. Mobley, et al.Petitioner
John T. Stewart, III, et al.Respondent
H. P. WrightAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information