judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER MERRA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0493
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER MERRA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-25285-09Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/19/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/24/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/27/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Merra YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elana SuttenbergYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Enid Hinkes, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Enid Hinkes, Esquire
05/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (9 pgs/Price) 2/14/11 proc.
07/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (197 pgs/Price) 2/15/11 proc.
07/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (120 pgs/Price) 2/16/11 proc.
07/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (18 pgs/Price) 2/17/11 proc. w/cd
07/21/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/21/2011FiledRecord Index
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (13 pgs/tape) 4/14/11 proc.
04/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (81 pgs/Henderson) 2/9/11 proc.
04/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (152 pgs/Lindsay) 2/10/11 proc. w/cd
04/19/2012FiledRecord Completed
04/26/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/14/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/14/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
06/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 7/13/12
07/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
08/15/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/15/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/25/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/14/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
01/17/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/17/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion for Leave to Late File Reply Brief (Appellant)
01/22/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
01/24/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Belson
02/14/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
02/26/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
03/04/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 3/14/13.
03/21/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/27/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/27/2013FiledMandate