judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHELLE MOWERY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0127)
Case Number:S-10-0127Case Docketed On:06/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:MICHELLE MOWERY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHELLE MOWERY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichelle MowreyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
E. Jeannee Nunn
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jessica Y. Frint
Jessica G. Van Norman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 38
Citation:247 P.3d 866

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/13/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
08/05/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/06/2010Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for Appellant re transferring the record to the Attorney GeneralCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/06/2010Event - Phone Call from AG re spelling of Appellant's name. Misspelled on NOA, corrected in caption.EventPhone CallFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Consent of Client for E. Jeannee Nunn to appear on behalf of Appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/20/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for for Jessica Frint, Student Director, and Jessica Van Norman, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
09/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and Approval for Jessica G. Van Norman and Jessica Y. Frint to appear on behalf of appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/08/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - E. Jeannee Nunn, Student Intern for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/18/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica G. Van Norman, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/10/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP and E. Jeannee Nunn, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Nunn for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Jessica G. Van Norman, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Norman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/21/2011Petition - Rehearing; and brief in support of petition.PetitionRehearingFinal
03/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Appellant's Brief in Support of Petition for Rehearing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/22/2011Event - Phone Call to Counsel for Appellant requesting signed original copiesEventPhone CallFinal
03/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - pages of Petition and Brief with Original SignaturesNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/12/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/18/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal