judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CHARLENE WILKINSON v. LOUIS EDWARD STEVISON

Case: B-4310
B-4310
11/20/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLENE WILKINSON
LOUIS EDWARD STEVISON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/22/1974Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent
08/13/1974Amended PetitionPetitioner
12/04/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
11/20/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/1974Opinion issued
08/22/1974Amended Response to Petition for Review filed
08/13/1974Amended Petition
07/10/1974Document received (See Remarks)
12/04/1973Response to Petition
11/20/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/20/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charlene WilkinsonPetitioner
Louis Edward StevisonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information