judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOWN OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT v. LONNIE PORTER

Case Heading (S-10-0133)
Case Number:S-10-0133Case Docketed On:06/16/2010
Linked To: S-09-0178
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:TOWN OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT v. LONNIE PORTER
Full Title:TOWN OF EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, Appellant (Defendant), v. LONNIE PORTER, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTown of Evansville Police DepartmentJudith A. W. Studer
AppelleeLonnie PorterKeith Robert Nachbar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Appellate Procedure, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 86
Citation:256 P.3d 476

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter, Briefing resumed in S-09-0178.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Record Completion notice with corrected date NOA filedNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/02/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/02/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
08/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Town of Evansville Police Department. Designation of Record on Appeal and Motion to Consolidate AppealsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2010Order - Consolidating cases for argument and decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
09/16/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/17/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed motion to extend deadline to file Appellee's brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Lonnie PorterEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Keith Nachbar for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Town of Evansville Police DepartmentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Judith Studer for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/03/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/09/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Judith A.W. Studer for appellant; Keith Robert Nachbar for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/01/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with directions, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/07/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel and requested original and six copies of stipulated motion to withdraw a document (dismiss appeals).EventPhone CallFinal
06/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Withdrawal of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Order on Stipulated Withdrawal of AppealOrderOtherFinal
07/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/06/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/5/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/11/2011Correspondence - Incoming other. Received copy of letter to counsel from Judge Sullins regarding Order on Remand.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal