judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVONE NEWSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0498
Short Caption:KEVONE NEWSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1989-02Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/09/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevone M. NewsonY
Jenifer WicksYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. Gidez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/04/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 20, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/10/2011RECORD INDEX
05/10/2011RECORD COPIES
05/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo and appendix
07/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief
11/10/2011FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until March 16, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
12/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until March 16, 2012
03/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until April 16, 2012 (Appellant)
04/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix, filing the lodged brief and limited appendix and directing the appellee's brief to be filed within 30 days from the date of this order
04/23/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/23/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until June 22, 2012 (Appellee)Granted
05/31/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before June 22, 2012
06/22/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
06/22/2012FiledBriefing Completed
07/13/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/09/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Washington,Glickman,Nebeker
11/27/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
12/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
12/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to January 4, 2013.
01/04/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
03/11/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
03/22/2013FiledMandate
06/13/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
10/09/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)