judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TOPPO VS. TOPPO

Case Information: 33615
Short Caption:TOPPO VS. TOPPOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D230096Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Jimmerson, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/25/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SEALED) Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00283
01/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
01/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/15/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James J. Jimmerson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00557
01/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 1/15/99. 99-00621
01/28/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of David C. Amesbury--check no. 8383.
02/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 11/24/99 and 11/25/99 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Clark County Family Court Transcript Video Services Office (mailed on: 02/17/99). 99-01168
02/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 11/24/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-01233
04/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-03037
04/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-03274
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction to consider this appeal. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 99-03427
05/10/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Supreme Court Order Filed April 29, 1999. 99-03753
05/13/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-03918
07/08/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. We conclude thate the order is substantively appealable as a final judgment and that the notice of appeal was timely filed. Opening brief due: 40 days; Answering brief due: 20 days from opening; Reply brief due: 10 days from answering. No extensions absent unforeseeable circumstances. 99-06030
08/17/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 8/16/99. 99-07669
08/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix). 99-07853
08/26/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 8/25/99. 99-08008
08/26/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Amended Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief. 99-08009
09/20/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Sharen Irene Toppo's Answering Brief. Mailed on: 9/17/99. 99-08890
09/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent Sharen Irene Toppo's Appendix. 99-08892
10/14/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 10/13/99. 99-09966
10/18/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 99-10084
09/25/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-16906
09/25/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Panel: SNP00A-CY/WM/NB.
12/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having concluded that Marian's contentions are without merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." fn3[Marian also claims that respondent Sharen T. should be estopped from asserting that res judicata bars this paternity action. We do not reach Marian's additional contentions.] fn4[Respondent Sharen T. contends this appeal is frivolous and asks for an award of attorney's fees and costs pursuant to NRAP 38. We disagree and conclude that fees and costs on appeal are unwarranted in this matter.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-21453
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21743
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21743