judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER DONALD HOWARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0132)
Case Number:S-10-0132Case Docketed On:06/16/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER DONALD HOWARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER DONALD HOWARD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Donald HowardDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 43
Citation:249 P.3d 230

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/02/2010Brief - Anders (No Response Time)BriefAndersFinal
08/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/02/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2010Order - Deny - Anders brief and Order Requiring the Public Defender to File Brief Addressing the MeritsOrderDeny - Anders briefFinal
08/25/2010Record - Returned unfiled record to Office of Public DefenderRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
09/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal and amended designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/27/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/18/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/10/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/30/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/29/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal