judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0497
Short Caption:JAMES L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7396-05Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/07/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/02/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames L. Williams YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John P. Gidez YN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/21/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Deborah Persico, Esquire
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, and it further appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Deborah Persico, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeael nunc pro tunc to April 21, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/17/2011RECORD INDEX
05/17/2011RECORD COPIES
05/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo until completion of transcripts
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
01/03/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
01/03/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
02/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before March 7, 2012
03/07/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/07/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/12/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)Granted
05/03/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)
06/12/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
06/26/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/06/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/13/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
09/13/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/28/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (24 pgs/tape) 12/27/05 proc. w/cd
10/02/2012FiledArgued before Judges Oberly, Easterly, Steadman
10/24/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senor Judge)
11/15/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledMandate