Case: 08-94-00105-CR
08-94-00105-CR
05/02/1994
Capital Murder
Contreras, Albert Hernandez
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/24/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/12/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
09/20/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/20/1996 | Shuck purged | | |
09/20/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/17/1996 | Order entered | | |
06/17/1996 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | |
06/10/1996 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
06/07/1996 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
03/13/1996 | Fee paid | | |
03/04/1996 | Fee paid | | |
02/20/1996 | Fee paid | | |
02/06/1996 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
02/05/1996 | Fee paid | | |
01/26/1996 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |
01/23/1996 | Fee paid | | |
01/23/1996 | Fee paid | | |
01/11/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/04/1996 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
01/03/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/15/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
12/13/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
11/27/1995 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
11/27/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
10/27/1995 | Order entered | | |
10/18/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/18/1995 | Order entered | | |
10/18/1995 | Motion - extend time to file a MFR - Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/16/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
10/16/1995 | Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed | | |
09/28/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/28/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/28/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/14/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/14/1995 | Submission | | |
06/14/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/12/1995 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
04/13/1995 | Submission | | |
02/28/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
02/28/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/28/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/11/1995 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/29/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/07/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
11/09/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/31/1994 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
10/25/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/20/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/07/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/10/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/10/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/16/1994 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
05/02/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/02/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/29/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CONTRERAS, ALBERT HERNANDEZ | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. David B. Fannin Hon. Martin Underwood Hon. Mark Stevens |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Don Clemmer Hon. Shane Phelps |
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Reeves
93-04-05639-CRR
Life