judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF SALOMONS

Case Information: 33612
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF SALOMONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/14/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 and 2. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00274
03/25/1999Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. Judgment: " . . . we order that Salomons be suspended from the prqctice of law for one year from June 23, 1998, the date of temporary suspension, that he be placed on probation for a period of three years, and that he pay the costs of this disciplinary prodeeding." The parties shall comply with the notification provisons of SCR 115, to the extent they have not already done so in accordance with the order of temporary suspension. En Banc 99-02177
03/25/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
03/26/1999RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned record on appeal, volumes 1 and 2.
03/31/1999RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by Bar Counsel on March 29, 1999.
04/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. 99-02767